Poser v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Michael J Poser
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00122
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to Attorney General re #6 Certified Mail Receipt. (JM)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to SSA re #6 Certified Mail. (JM)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick W Snyder on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Snyder, Patrick)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued as to USA. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (JM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS (7060 Atty General; 7053 SSA) re #4 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (JM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM - cc: USM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Michael J Poser. Proof of service due by 4/25/2019.(JM)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint and issue Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/25/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RFJ)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael J Poser. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael J Poser. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poser v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Patrick W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Poser
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?