Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 68.229.55.19

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 68.229.55.19
Case Number: 2:2019cv00143
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena; filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #2 Declaration of Greg Lanksy, #3 Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #4 Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Proposed Order) (Sutehall, Kevin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/29/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich.This case has been randomly assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
January 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC added. (Sutehall, Kevin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 68.229.55.19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5404933) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Proof of service due by 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutehall, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 68.229.55.19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 68.229.55.19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Represented By: Kevin M Sutehall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?