Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.189.167.150

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.189.167.150
Case Number: 2:2019cv00145
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/26/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Court is satisfied with Plaintiff's response (ECF No. 7) to its prior order to show cause (ECF No. 6 ). The Court will grant the ex parte motion for leave to serve subpoena (ECF No. #5 ). (no image attached)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to 6 Minute Order,,,,, by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emilie Kennedy) (Sutehall, Kevin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/14/2019. The Court may sua sponte raise the issue of lack of subject matter jurisdiction and must dismiss a case if no subject matter jurisdiction exists. Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(h)(3). Even where neither party contests subject matter jurisdiction, courts are bound to address it sua sponte if it is questionable. Gilder v. PGA Tour, Inc., 936 F.2d 417, 421 (9th Cir.1991) (citation omitted). Plaintiff is therefore directed to show cause in writing within ten days of the entry of this order how it has standing to enforce its purported copyrights. See Righthaven LLC v. Hoehn, 716 F.3d 1166, 1169 (9th Cir. 2013) ("Under the Copyright Act, only the legal or beneficial owner of an exclusive right under a copyright has standing to sue for infringement of that right.") (citation omitted); see also, e.g., https://cocatalog.loc.gov/cgi-bin/Pwebrecon.cgi?Search_Arg=PA0002136725&Search_Code=REGS&PID=fT81-O1agsUuEtuaKwNsASSrCwLFI&SEQ=20190214153335&CNT=25&HIST=1 (indicating that Plaintiff obtained its rights in the copyright with registration number PA0002136725 by written agreement).(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Houston, Thad)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Proposed Order) (Sutehall, Kevin)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/28/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
January 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MR)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC added. (Sutehall, Kevin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.189.167.150 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5405056) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Proof of service due by 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutehall, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.189.167.150
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Represented By: Kevin M Sutehall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.189.167.150
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?