Mayorga v. Ronaldo
Plaintiff: Kathryn Mayorga
Defendant: Christiano Ronaldo and Cristiano Ronaldo
Interested Party: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Intervenor: The New York Times Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00168
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
2 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 JUDGMENT in favor of Cristiano Ronaldo against Kathryn Mayorga. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/10/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 154 Mayorga's motion for reconsideration is Granted, in that the court has reconsidered its ruling, but any relief from that ruling is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mayorga's objection [ECF No. 152] to the magistrate judges order denying her motion for in camera review is OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 153 Mayorga's objection to the magistrate judge's report and recommendation is OVERRULED. The magistrate judge's #143 recommendation to grant Ronaldo's 111 and #112 motion for sanctions and dismiss this case is ADOPTED consistent with this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/10/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER adopting #193 Report and Recommendation. ORDER denying as moot #168 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #176 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/5/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying as moot #161 Motion for Protective Order. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Mayorga's motion for a preliminary injunction (ECF No. #168 ) and The Times' motion to intervene (ECF No. #176 ) be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 3/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 REPLY to Response to #176 Motion to Intervene, by Intervenor The New York Times Company. (McLetchie, Margaret)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 REPLY to #172 Notice (Other), by Interested Party Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Nichols, Jacqueline)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 RESPONSE to #176 Motion to Intervene, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. Replies due by 2/15/2022. (Works, Kendelee)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 RESPONSE to #172 Notice (Other), by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Perdue, Keely)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #183 Stipulation Re: #172 Notice and #176 Motion to Intervene. Responses due by 2/8/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/27/2022, nunc pro tunc 1/25/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO THE NOTICE REGARDING REAL PARTY IN INTERESTS, LAS VEGAS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT, CRIMINAL INVESTIGATIVE FILE [ECF 172] AND THE NEW YORK TIMES COMPANYS MOTION TO INTERVENE [ECF 176] (THIRD REQUEST) by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #181 Stipulation Re: #172 Notice, #176 Motion to Intervene. Responses due by 1/25/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/24/2022 nunc pro tunc to January 18, 2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for Plaintiff and Defendants Responses re #176 Motion to Intervene and #172 Notice Regarding Real Party in Interests Criminal Investigative File by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee) Modified text on 1/19/2022 (EDS).
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 REPLY to #172 Notice (Other), by Interested Party Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. (Nichols, Jacqueline)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant's responses to the #172 notice regarding real party in interest's, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, criminal investigative file currently due on January 11, 2022, be extended to January 18, 2022; and further that the parties' responses to The New York Times Company's #175 Motion to Intervene, currently due on January 12, 2022, be extended to January 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/12/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Extent Time to Respond to #172 Notice Regarding Real Party in Interests and #176 Motion to Intervene by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie) Modified on 1/12/2022 (EDS).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 RESPONSE to #172 Notice (Other), by Intervenor The New York Times Company. (McLetchie, Margaret)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor The New York Times Company. Responses due by 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Margaret A. McLetchie in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit Proposed Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order, #3 Exhibit Proposed Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (McLetchie, Margaret)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #170 Stipulation Re: #161 Motion for Protective Order, #168 Motion for Preliminary Injunction The New York Time's Motion to Intervene and their Responses to both motions are due by 12/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #171 Stipulation Re: [163 Response to 154 Motion to Amend/Correct. Replies due by 1/7/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE Notice Regarding Real Party in Interest's, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Criminal Investigative File by Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department re #168 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #161 Motion for Protective Order. (Nichols, Jacqueline)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Plaintiff to File Reply to #163 RESPONSE to 154 Order on Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie) Modified on 12/27/2021 (EDS).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) FOR THE NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS #161 MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 REPLY to Response to #161 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. Responses due by 12/28/2021. (Stovall, Leslie)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 RESPONSE to #161 Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. Replies due by 12/21/2021. (Stovall, Leslie)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #165 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plantiff to File Reply to Defendant's Response to 154 Motion to Amend/Correct. Replies due by 12/23/2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for plaintiff to file a reply to defendants response to plaintiffs motion to amend order sustaining in part objection and adopting and modifying in part report & recommendations [ECF 72, section III, p. 24:2-121]. by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 RESPONSE to Objection to #143 Report and Recommendation GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR TERMINAL [SIC] SANCTIONS [FILED UNDER SEAL AS ECF NO. 153] by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RESPONSE to #72 Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, Order on Report and Recommendation,, Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 RESPONSE to Objection to #143 Report and Recommendation by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee) Modified on 12/7/2021 (EDS).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Perdue, Keely)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 Stipulation Re: 154 Motion to Amend/Correct, Responses due by 12/3/2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant to File Oppositions to Plaintiffs Objections to Report and Recommendation Granting Defendants Motion for Terminal Sanctions [ECF No. 153, filed under seal]; Plaintiffs Objection to Magistrate Judges Recommendation Denying in Camera Review [ECF No. 152, filed under seal]; and Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Order Sustaining in Part Objection and Adopting and Modifying in Part Report and Recommendation [ECF No. 154, filed under seal] by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 WITHDRAWAL of #156 Motion by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #151 Stipulation; Objections to R&R due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/9/21 Nunc pro tunc 11/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. Responses due by 11/19/2021. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to File an Objection to #143 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie) Modified on 11/4/2021 (EDS).
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #147 Stipulation Re: #143 Report and Recommendation, Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2021. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 RESPONSE to #148 Notice that Plaintiff Filed Unauthorized Stipulation #146 by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie) Modified on 10/21/2021 (EDS).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE that Plaintiff Filed Unauthorized Stipulation #146 by Cristiano Ronaldo . (Works, Kendelee) Modified text on 10/21/2021 (EDS).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Plaintiff to file an Objection to #143 Order and Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie) Modified on 10/21/2021 (EDS).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ERROR: Filed in error by counsel. See #147 for corrected filing. First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN OBJECTION TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER AND REPORT RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie) Modified on 10/21/2021 (EDS).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/20/2021. ORDER denying #144 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Objections. The parties have stipulated to extend plaintiff's deadline to file an objection to the most recent report and recommendation #143 . LR IA 6-1 requires the parties to "state the reasons for the extension requested." This stipulation lacks this information. Accordingly, the stipulation #144 is DENIED without prejudice to the filing of a new stipulation that complies with the rules of this court and explains the reason that the extension is needed so that the court can determine if good cause exists to approve the stipulation. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Plaintiff to File an Objection to #143 Order and Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie) Modified on 10/19/2021 (EDS).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and ORDER denying 124 Motion for in-camera review. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Ronaldo's motion for case terminating sanctions (ECF No. 111 / #112 ) be granted. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Mayorga's action be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 10/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 140 Miscellaneous Hearing, held on 09/17/2021, before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samantha McNett, SNM@nvd.uscourts.gov. Recording start and end times: 11:05 a.m. - 12:38 p.m. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 11/6/2021. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 1/4/2022. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (SNM)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/30/2021. It is Ordered that a Transcript of the 140 9/17/2021 proceedings be prepared on an expedited basis. Liberty Counters 11:05-12:38. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re emergency motion for case terminating sanctions and to disqualify Stovall & Associates 111 and its redacted version #112 , motion to seal #113 , motion to extend time #115 , and sealed motion for in camera review of the football leak documents to determine whether the crime/fraud excemptioin applies 124 held on 9/17/2021 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Pla Counsel: Leslie Stovall; Def Counsel: Peter Christiansen and Kendelee Works; Recording start and end times: 11:05 - 12:38; Courtroom: 3A; The court canvasses and hears representations and arguments from counsel. ORDERED motion to seal #113 and motion for extension of time #115 are both GRANTED, as stated on the record. Emergency motion for case terminating sanctions and to disqualify Stovall & Associates 111 and its redacted version #112 , and sealed motion for in camera review of the football leak documents to determine whether the crime/fraud exception applies 124 are taken under submission and the court will issue a separate order, as stated on the record. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/10/2021. By Judicial Assistant: K. LaPointe. Regarding ECF Nos. 111 #112 MOTION for Sanctions, #115 MOTION to Extend Time, #113 MOTION to Seal, 124 MOTION for In Camera Review of the Football Leak Documents: Motion Hearing is set for Friday, September 17, 2021 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. This hearing will be conducted in-person. All persons attending the hearing are required to wear a face mask while in the courthouse. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying in part #135 Motion to Extend Time Re: 124 Motion for an in-camera review of the Football Leaks documents. Replies due by 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 RESPONSE to #135 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. Replies due by 9/8/2021. (Works, Kendelee)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to Reply to 124 Plaintiff's Motion for In Camera Review of the Football Leaks Documents to Determine Whether the Crime Fraud Exception Applies by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie) Modified on 9/1/2021 (EDS).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 RESPONSE to 124 First SEALED MOTION for In Camera Review of the Football Leak Documents to Determine whether the Crime/Fraud Exception Applies by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. Replies due by 8/25/2021. (Works, Kendelee) Modified on 8/19/2021 (EDS).
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REPLY to Response to #112 Motion for Sanctions,,, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 REPLY to Response to #113 Motion to Seal by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 First STIPULATION re Discovery To Stay All Discovery Pending the Court's Decision on Various Motions by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/28/2021. Re: [118 and 119] Plaintiff's Motions to Extend Time to Respond to ECF Nos. 111 and 113. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to ECF No. 113 #118 and Motion to Extend Time to Respond to ECF No. 111 #119 are DENIED as moot in light of the parties' Stipulation to Extend Time #127 . The parties are encouraged to attempt to communicate about and stipulate to any future extension requests before filing motions to extend. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #127 Stipulation for Defendant to File Replies and Opposition re #112 Motion for Sanctions and #113 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant to FIle Replies and an Opposition re: ECF Nos. 111, 113, 123, 124, and 126 re #112 Motion for Sanctions,,, #113 Motion to Seal by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPLY to #121 Response to #118 , #119 Motions, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie) Modified on 7/1/2021 to link to Motions (SLD).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 RESPONSE to #119 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, #118 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. Replies due by 7/1/2021. (Works, Kendelee)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPLY to Response to #115 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Moynihan, Ross)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Terminating Sanctions re #112 Motion for Sanctions,,, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Seal re #113 Motion to Seal by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE Receipt of Copy Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Written Discovery by Kathryn Mayorga. (Moynihan, Ross)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE to #115 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. Replies due by 6/11/2021. (Works, Kendelee)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Written Discovery Requests re #99 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Moynihan, Ross)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 6/1/2021. By Judicial Assistant: K. LaPointe.Re: 111 #112 Motion for Sanctions. Having reviewed Defendant's Emergency Motion for Case Terminating Sanctions and to Disqualify Stovall & Associates, the Court finds that expedited consideration is unnecessary under LR IA 6-1(d). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that response and reply briefs are due in the ordinary course. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the depositions scheduled on June 23, 24, 25 and 28 shall NOT go forward on the scheduled dates and are STAYED until the Court rules on the pending motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Expert Deadline is stayed pending the ruling on the instant motion. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION to Seal by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Emergency MOTION [REDACTED VERSION OF ECF NO. 111] for Case Terminating Sanctions and to Disqualify Stovall & Associates by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. Responses due by 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D--filed under seal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P--filed under seal, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit Exhibit W--filed under seal, #24 Exhibit Exhibit X) (Works, Kendelee) Modified event and text on 5/28/2021 (EDS).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Custodian of Records - Michaela Wood re #99 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Michaela Wood re #99 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #102 Stipulation regarding Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/30/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Kathy Bongiovi re #99 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Joe Bongiovi re #99 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Custodian of Records - Joe Bongiovi re #99 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 AFFIDAVIT of Attempted Service - Joe Bongiovi re #99 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 AFFIDAVIT of Attempted Service - Kathy Bongiovi re #99 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION re Discovery Depositions by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Perdue, Keely)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER for Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #99 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,, Scheduling Order, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Perdue, Keely)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Extend Time; ORDER granting #92 Motion for Protective Order; Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Motions due by 11/1/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY to Response to #92 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Perdue, Keely)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPLY to Response to #90 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE to #92 Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. Replies due by 4/22/2021. (Stovall, Leslie)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE to #90 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. Replies due by 4/21/2021. (Stovall, Leslie)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #92 Motion for Protective Order by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Christiansen, Peter)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Perdue, Keely)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Retained and Non-Retained Experts Pursuant to FRCP 26 (a)(2)(B) and (C) by Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #80 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter S. Christiansen. (Christiansen, Peter)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #73 Notice of Appeal filed by Kathryn Mayorga. DISMISSED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' stipulation #85 is GRANTED; plaintiff's deadline to file her objection to Magistrate Judge Albregts's order at ECF No. #80 is EXTENDED to January 8, 2021, defendant has until January 15, 2021, to file his reply, and plaintiff's motion for an extension of time #84 is deemed WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) For Plaintiff's Filing of Objection to the Magistrate Judges December 2, 2020 re #80 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Second MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) to File Objections to Scheduling Order re #80 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting #82 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Objection re #80 Order (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) For Plaintiff's Filing of Objection to the Magistrate Judges December 2, 2020 re #80 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SCHEDULING ORDER granting in part and denying in part #79 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Motions due by 8/2/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 First Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Stipulation to file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION (First Request) and Order to Seek Leave to File Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and Extend Time to File Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee) Modified on 11/23/2020 (EDS).
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #73 Notice of Appeal filed by Kathryn Mayorga. USCA Case Number 20-17148. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #73 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-2. Incorrect case number on document. The correct case number is 2:19-cv-00168-JAD-DJA. See Clerk's Notice at ECF No. 25 .Attorney Leslie Stovall is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #73 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Order form) (MMM)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-6236379. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Stovall, Leslie)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Sustaining in Part 70 Objection; Adopting and Modifying in Part #67 Report and Recommendation; and thereby resolving #26 motion to compel arbitration, #29 motion to dismiss, #55 motion to strike, 58 motion to appoint guardian ad litem, and 66 motion for leave to file excess pages. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/30/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CH)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE to 70 Objection to #67 Report and Recommendation,, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/3/2020. Re #68 Motion to Extend Time. Good cause appearing, the Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Report and Recommendations #68 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to file objections to the report and recommendation #67 is extended to 3/3/2020. Plaintiff is cautioned, however, that COUNSEL'S WORKLOAD WILL NOT CONSTITUTE GOOD CAUSE FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF THIS DEADLINE. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendations re #67 Report and Recommendation,, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that #26 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings be granted. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that #55 Defendant's Motion to Strike be granted. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that 66 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages be granted. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that #29 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss be denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that 58 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Guardian AdLitem be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ERRATA to #50 Reply by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPLY to Response to #55 Motion to Strike by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting #62 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #55 Motion to Strike. Replies due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Continue Time for Filing Reply re #55 Motion to Strike by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/21/2019. Re #59 Motion to Extend time to Respond to Motion to Strike. Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to extend time to file a response to defendant's motion to strike and maintain documents under seal #59 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the motion #55 is extended to 11/27/19. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to #55 Defendant Christiano Ronaldos Motion to Strike and Maintain Under Seal Inadmissible Documents Attached to Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Discovery Hearing held on 11/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Leslie Stovall; Def Counsel: Peter Christiansen and Kendelee Works; Time of Hearing: 11:13 - 11:38 a.m.; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to #53 First Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order.IT IS ORDERED THAT #53 First Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Stay of Discovery is entered until the pending #26 Motion to Compel Arbitration and #29 Motion to Dismiss are decided by an order of the Court. In the event the case survives, a Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order shall be due within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of the order on those motions. Plaintiff shall send a courtesy copy of the 44 Errata to chambers within one week from today pursuant to LR IC2-2(g).Defendant shall file a complete unredacted copy of the Settlement and Confidentiality Agreement on the docket under seal within one week from today. The minutes of this proceeding and the transcript will serve as the Court's official ruling. No separate written order will issue. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Strike by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. Responses due by 11/20/2019. (Works, Kendelee) (Main Document 55 replaced on 11/7/2019) (EDS).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/31/2019. By Deputy Clerk: T Renfro. Discovery Hearing Re: #53 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is set for Thursday, November 7, 2019 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 First Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY to Response to #29 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 REPLY to Response to #26 Motion to Compel, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting #48 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #26 Motion to Compel, #29 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 10/14/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Extend Time for Filing Replies re #26 Motion to Compel, #29 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #45 the parties' stipulation to maintain the seal on Mayorga's motion-to-compel response and exhibits pending further briefing is GRANTED. Ronaldo's motion to strike and seal Mayorga's exhibits 4 and 5 must be filed by 11/6/19. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #42 Mayorga's motion to extend time is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and Order to Seal Attorney-Client Privileged and Attorney Work-Product Documents Attached to Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration [ECF 44] by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Perdue, Keely)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Response to #26 Motion to Compel, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting #38 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #29 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/20/2019. Replies due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #37 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #26 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. Responses due by 9/20/2019. Replies due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO CONTINUE (First Request) to Extend Time for Plaintiff's Filing of Opposition and Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO CONTINUE (First Request) to Extend Time for Plaintiff's Filing of Opposition and Replies to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/26/2019. Re #35 Stipulation and Order to Stay Discovery and Continue Briefing Schedule. The parties have stipulated to stay discovery pending the outcome of Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration #26 and Motion to Dismiss #29 . In doing so, they seek to avoid the Rule 26 conference and permit the possibility that Plaintiff may seek leave to conduct discovery if necessary. They also seek to extend the briefing schedule for the pending motions. LR IA 6-1 requires the parties to state the reasons for the extension requested. This stipulation lacks this information and fails to contain any points or authorities to support why a stay of discovery is justified. Further, Plaintiffs representation that she may seek discovery fails to explain what discovery she believes may be needed. Accordingly, the stipulation #35 is DENIED without prejudice to file a new stipulation that complies with the rules of this court and explains the reason that the extension to the briefing schedule is needed and why a stay of discovery is warranted supported by case law so that the court can determine if good cause exists to approve the stipulation. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB) Modified docket relationship on 8/28/2019 (EDS).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) of Briefing Schedule re #26 Motion to Compel, #29 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Perdue, Keely)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/20/2019. Pursuant to the #33 Errata filed notifying the Court that the #32 Memorandum is discovery correspondence and was filed in error, it is ordered that the #32 Memorandum is stricken from the docket. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DES)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ERRATA to #32 Memorandum by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STRICKEN PER ecf. 34 MEMORANDUM to #26 Motion to Compel, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #29 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. Responses due by 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Works, Kendelee)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #26 Motion, by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. Responses due by 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A--Press Release, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B--1st Page of Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C--Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (Works, Kendelee) Event modified by Clerk's Office on 8/9/2019 (EDS).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-00168-JAD-DJA. (no image attached) (JQC)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Redacted ECF No. 11 Pursuant to Court Order ECF No. #23 by Cristiano Ronaldo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Christiansen, Peter) Modified on 8/7/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Ronaldo's motion to seal [ECF No. 11 ] is GRANTED in part, Ronaldo's motion for leave to file excess pages [ECF No. #10 ] is DENIED, and Ronaldo's motion to dismiss or, alternatively, to compel arbitration [ECF No. 13 ] is DENIED without prejudice. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/31/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SEALED NOTICE; filed by Cristiano Ronaldo. (Perdue, Keely) Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (DC).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SEALED DECLARATION of Kendelee L. Works In Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Notice of Non-Opposition re #10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee) Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (DC).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SEALED NOTICE Receipt of Copy by Cristiano Ronaldo. (Perdue, Keely) Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (DC).
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SEALED Objection to #18 Notice of Non-Opposition re #10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. Replies due by 7/12/2019.(Stovall, Leslie) Modified event and to link to underlying motion on 7/9/2019 (EDS). Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (DC).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SEALED NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Cristiano Ronaldo re #10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Works, Kendelee) Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (DC).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Mayorga. Cristiano Ronaldo served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Stovall, Leslie) Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (DC).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Mayorga. Kathryn Mayorga served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Stovall, Leslie) Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (DC).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SEALED NOTICE Receipt of Copy by Cristiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee) Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (DC).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SEALED NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Cristiano Ronaldo. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Works, Kendelee) Unsealed on 7/31/2019 (DC).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Christiano Ronaldo. (Works, Kendelee)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christiano Ronaldo that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Multisports & Image Management (M. I. M.) Ltd. for Christiano Ronaldo added. (Christiansen, Peter)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Status Foreign Service Italy re #7 Order on Motion for Service by Publication,,, by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for Service by Publication; Plaintiff's request for alternative service is DENIED without prejudice. Proof of service is extended 180 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Leslie Mark Stovall re #5 Motion for Service by Publication by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 6-10, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 11-18, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 19 (part 1 of 2), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 19 (part 2 of 2), #6 Exhibit Exhibits 20-22, #7 Exhibit Exhibits 23-35)(Stovall, Leslie)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Service by Publication by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Christiano Ronaldo re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Kathryn Mayorga. (Stovall, Leslie)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kathryn Mayorga. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stovall, Leslie)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (ADR)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5408064) by Kathryn Mayorga. Proof of service due by 4/28/2019.(Stovall, Leslie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayorga v. Ronaldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiano Ronaldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristiano Ronaldo
Represented By: Kendelee L. Works
Represented By: Peter S. Christiansen
Represented By: Whitney Barrett
Represented By: Keely Ann Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Mayorga
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Ross Heber Moynihan
Represented By: Larissa D Drohobyczer
Represented By: R. Todd Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Jacqueline Victoria Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The New York Times Company
Represented By: Margaret A McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?