American Automobile Association, Inc. v. AAA Anytime, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: American Automobile Association, Inc.
Defendant: AAA Anytime, Inc., Mitchell Winik and Katherine Carter
Case Number: 2:2019cv00255
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (Second Request). IT IS ORDERED that a 30-day extension, or until 5/6/2019, is granted for the defendant to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. No further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff American Automobile Association, Inc.. (Freeman, David)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Yurij D. Melnyk for American Automobile Association, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel David J. Freeman. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/28/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Yurij D. Melnyk and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David J. Freeman (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5482909) by Plaintiff American Automobile Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Freeman, David)
March 20, 2019 Party Katherine Carter terminated per #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MR)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff American Automobile Association, Inc.. (Freeman, David)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Defendants answer due 4/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff American Automobile Association, Inc.. (Freeman, David)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Automobile Association, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. Katherine Carter served on 2/23/2019, answer due 3/16/2019. (Freeman, David)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Automobile Association, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,. Mitchell Winik served on 2/23/2019, answer due 3/16/2019. (Freeman, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Automobile Association, Inc. re #4 Summons Issued. AAA Anytime, Inc. served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Freeman, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American Automobile Association, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Freeman, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/13/2019. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Neil Roman and Yurij Melnyk to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/29/2019. (no image attached) (MR)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
February 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MR)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AAA Anytime, Inc., Katherine Carter, Mitchell Winik (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5429063) by THE AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, INC.. Proof of service due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Freeman, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Automobile Association, Inc. v. AAA Anytime, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Anytime, Inc.
Represented By: Philip A. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Winik
Represented By: Philip A. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Carter
Represented By: Philip A. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Automobile Association, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Freeman
Represented By: Neil Kenneth Roman
Represented By: Yurij Satish Das Melnyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?