Splan v. Cook Medical Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Elaine Splan
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, William Cook Europe APS, Cook Incorporated and Cook Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00281
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL RETURN re 11 Transmittal. Transferred case opened in the Southern District of Indiana as case 1:19cv06097, on 03/19/2019. (MR)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of case to the Southern District of Indiana. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (MR)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 Certified MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-65) transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by MDL on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-65) transferring case to the Southern District of Indiana. Signed by MDL on 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 MDL Minute Order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. William Cook Europe APS served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. Cook Medical Incorporated served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. Cook Incorporated served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine Splan re #2 Summons Issued. Cook Group, Inc. served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Perdue, Keely)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Elaine Splan that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Perdue, Keely)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. Plaintiff shall file her certificate of interested parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than March 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, William Cook Europe APS re #1 Complaint. (MMM)
February 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MMM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5432658) by Elaine Splan. Proof of service due by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cook Group Inc, #3 Summons Cook Incorporated, #4 Summons Cook Medical Inc, #5 Summons William Cook Europe APS)(Perdue, Keely) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Splan v. Cook Medical Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cook Europe APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Splan
Represented By: Peter S. Christiansen
Represented By: R. Todd Terry
Represented By: Keely Ann Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?