Thomas et al v. Clark County School District et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Woods and Deshun Thomas
Defendant: Pat Skorkowsky, Helen J. Stewart School, Patti Schultz, Beverly Dade, Clark County School District and Richard Fuller
Case Number: 2:2019cv00282
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Deshun Thomas, Kristin Woods. (Hauf, Marjorie)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Deshun Thomas, Kristin Woods. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hauf, Marjorie)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation; Re: #7 Motion to Dismiss, Responses due by 3/27/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) Stipulation and Order (Second Request) re #7 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiffs Deshun Thomas, Kristin Woods. (Hauf, Marjorie)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for plaintiff shall have until 3/26/2019 to comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Defendants Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller, Helen J. Stewart School, Patti Schultz, Pat Skorkowsky. (Herrera, Crystal)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation; Re: #7 Motion to Dismiss, Responses due by 3/20/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #7 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Deshun Thomas, Kristin Woods. (Hauf, Marjorie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller, Helen J. Stewart School, Patti Schultz, Pat Skorkowsky. (Herrera, Crystal)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller, Helen J. Stewart School, Patti Schultz, Pat Skorkowsky. Responses due by 3/7/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/7/2019. (Herrera, Crystal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/15/2019. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/14/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/1/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (JM)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-18-785900-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5432853) by Patti Schultz, Helen J. Stewart School, Beverly Dade, Clark County School District, Pat Skorkowsky, Richard Fuller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrera, Crystal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Attorney Action Required to #1 Notice (Other): ERROR: Filing fee not paid and wrong event selected by Crystal J. Herrera. CORRECTION: Attorney Crystal J. Herrera is advised to file the pleading using the correct event Petition of Removal in accordance with 28 U.S. Code 1446 and pay the required filing fee pursuant to 28 U.S. Code 1914. Attorney is advised until such time as the filing fee is paid no Judges will be assigned. Document #1 terminated as filed in error. (no image attached) (RFJ)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller, Helen J. Stewart School, Patti Schultz, Pat Skorkowsky. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Herrera, Crystal)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to FRCP and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Crystal J. Herrera. CORRECTION: Attorney to file documents pursuant to the federal and local rules. NOTICE; filed by Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller, Helen J. Stewart School, Patti Schultz, Pat Skorkowsky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrera, Crystal) Document #1 terminated as filed in error on 2/14/2019 (RFJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Clark County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Skorkowsky
Represented By: S. Scott Greenberg
Represented By: Crystal J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen J. Stewart School
Represented By: S. Scott Greenberg
Represented By: Crystal J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Schultz
Represented By: S. Scott Greenberg
Represented By: Crystal J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Dade
Represented By: S. Scott Greenberg
Represented By: Crystal J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: S. Scott Greenberg
Represented By: Crystal J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Fuller
Represented By: S. Scott Greenberg
Represented By: Crystal J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Woods
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Represented By: Jolene J Manke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshun Thomas
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Represented By: Jolene J Manke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?