U.S. Bank, National Association v. North American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00289
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by North American Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent States Title Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate U.S. Home Corporation, Other Affiliate Lennar Corporation, Other Affiliate CalAtlantic Title Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Lennar Financial Services, LLC, Other Affiliate LFS Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Saslaw-Simkoff Revocable Trust, Other Affiliate Foundation Capital VIII, L.P. for North American Title Insurance Company added. (Maurice, Aaron)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by North American Title Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/16/2019.(Maurice, Aaron) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank, National Association re #1 Complaint,,, #2 Summons Issued. North American Title Insurance Company served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank, National Association that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, National Association added. (Robbins, Lindsay)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/19/2019. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to North American Title Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (MR)
February 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North American Title Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5434824) by U.S. Bank, National Association as Trustee for Merrill Lynch Mortgage Investors Trust. Proof of service due by 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Summons)(Robbins, Lindsay) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, National Association v. North American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Christopher A.J. Swift
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?