Move 4 Less v. Queen Business Solutions
Plaintiff: MOVE 4 LESS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, and Move 4 Less, LLC
Defendant: QUEEN BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC, d/b/a MOVE ON MOVING, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, Ronald Spinabella and Digital Product Marketing, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Queen Business Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00321
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Queen Business Solutions, LLC re #8 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,. Digital Product Marketing, LLC served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Mushkin, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint Issued as to Digital Product Marketing, LLC, Ronald Spinabella re #8 Third Party Complaint. (MMM) (Main Document 10 replaced on 3/21/2019 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Queen Business Solutions, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mushkin, Michael)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, ( Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/4/2019.), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Digital Product Marketing, LLC, Ronald Spinabella by Queen Business Solutions, LLC. filed by Queen Business Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - DPM, #2 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - Spinabella)(Mushkin, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael R. Mushkin on behalf of Defendant Queen Business Solutions, LLC. (Mushkin, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Move 4 Less, LLC re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Queen Business Solutions, LLC served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Hicks, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Move 4 Less, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hicks, Jason)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Queen Business Solutions, LLC. (JM)
February 21, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued QUEEN BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC, d/b/a Move on Moving by Plaintiff MOVE 4 LESS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company,. (Hicks, Jason)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5440722) by MOVE 4 LESS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company,. Proof of service due by 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hicks, Jason) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Move 4 Less v. Queen Business Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEEN BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC, d/b/a MOVE ON MOVING, a Nevada Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Spinabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Product Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOVE 4 LESS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company,
Represented By: Jason Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Move 4 Less, LLC
Represented By: Jason Hicks
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Queen Business Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Linvel J Coppedge
Represented By: Michael R. Mushkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?