Mendez v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Rosa I. Mendez
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00368
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marcelo N Illarmo on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Illarmo, Marcelo)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Amended Complaint. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (ADR)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cc: USM - ADR)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCREENING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall ISSUE SUMMONS to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and DELIVER the summons and #4 Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall also ISSUE SUMMONS to the Commissioner of Social Security and the Attorney General of the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Rosa I. Mendez. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 6/19/2019.(Kalagian, Marc)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Rosa I. Mendez. (ADR)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCREENING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff Rosa I. Mendez's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall FILE the Complaint, but SHALL NOT issue summons. The Complaint is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Mendez shall have until 4/10/19, to file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 1, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (EDS)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rosa I. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kalagian, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Marcelo N Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa I. Mendez
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?