United States of America v. $70,000.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $70,000.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Steven McKim
Case Number: 2:2019cv00392
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/2/2019. Re: #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition does not comply with LR 1A 11-2(a). Certificate of Good Standing is missing from Petition. Counsel is advised to refile Petition with the Court, under event "Notice of Corrected Image" linking to #6 by May 16, 2019. Failure to comply will result in denial of Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Steven McKim. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Barnett, Richard)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Claim Opposing Forfeiture of Steven McKim filed by Steven McKim. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/15/2019.(Barnett, Richard) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard M. Barnett and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard A. Schonfeld (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5529157) by Defendant $70,000.00 in United States Currency. (Schonfeld, Richard)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Alexander Blum on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Blum, James)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/8/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2019: #1 Summons and Warrant) (JM).
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wenthe, Roger)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 VIEW Corrected Image #3 as to MOTION for Issuance of Summons and Warrant in rem; filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Wenthe, Roger) Document not filed pursaunt to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney. Court corrected entry on 3/7/2019 (RFJ). Modified on 3/8/2019 (RFJ).
March 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $70,000.00 in United States Currency by United States of America. Proof of service due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wenthe, Roger) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $70,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $70,000.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Richard A Schonfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Roger W. Wenthe
Represented By: James Alexander Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven McKim
Represented By: Richard M Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?