Top Secret Recipes. Inc. et al v. Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TSR Foods L.L.C. and Top Secret Recipes. Inc.
Defendant: Raising Cane's USA, LLC and Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00485
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting #35 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #30 Order (Second Request). Discovery due by 5/18/2020. Motions due by 6/16/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re Discovery re #30 Order by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Rothstein, Ronald) Modified on 12/9/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #32 Stipulation re Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #31 Stipulation re Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and Format for Document Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION re Discovery / Stipulated Protective Order by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Rothstein, Ronald)
October 23, 2019 Filing 31 STIPULATION re Discovery Of Electronically Stored Information And Format For Document Production by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Rothstein, Ronald)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #29 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #26 Order. Discovery due by 3/17/2020. Motions due by 4/17/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 17, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Extension of Time re Discovery re #26 Order by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Whipp, Megan) Modified on 9/18/2019 to reflect correct event and add docket entry relationship (MMM).
August 8, 2019 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-00485-RFB-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #24 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/18/2019. Motions due by 1/17/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Megan L. Whipp is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (MMM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs TSR Foods L.L.C., Top Secret Recipes. Inc. (Krieger, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Counterclaim, filed by Top Secret Recipes. Inc., TSR Foods LLC..(Krieger, John) Modified on 6/18/2019 to include additional filing party. (MMM).
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE; filed by Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Higgins, Brigid)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald Y. Rothstein for Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brigid Higgins. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan L. Whipp for Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brigid Higgins. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #17 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Counter Claimants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Higgins, Brigid)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #16 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Counter Claimants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Higgins, Brigid)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Counter Claimants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Higgins, Brigid)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Counter Claimants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Higgins, Brigid)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE - Regarding violation of the Local Rules and Attorney Action required as to document #14 - ERROR: Wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. CORRECTION: Attorney Brigid Higgins is advised to refile document #14 using the correct event in accordance with LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d). Document #14 is terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1. (no image attached) (RFJ)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by Brigid Higgins. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document using the correct event in accordance with the local rules. MOTION by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Counter Claimants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. Responses due by 6/13/2019.(Higgins, Brigid) Document #14 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1 on 5/30/2019 (RFJ).
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/23/2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #11 and #12 are DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners Megan L. Whipp and Ronald Y. Rothstein shall include the printed names, signature AND title of the party(ies) appointing Designated Resident Nevada Counsel in this case, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 5, Lines 5-15 of the Verified Petition For Permission To Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted To The Bar Of This Court And Designation Of Local Counsel.Petitioners shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file corrected Verified Petitions using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petitions, and Petitioners will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 View Corrected Image #19 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Y. Rothstein and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brigid M. Higgins (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5558900) by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Counter Claimants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Higgins, Brigid)
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 View Corrected Image #18 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Megan L. Whipp and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brigid M. Higgins (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5558863) by Defendants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Counter Claimants Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. (Higgins, Brigid)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ronald Y. Rothstein and Megan L. Whipp to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/6/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC, Raising Cane's USA, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Higgins, Brigid)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint ( Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/5/2019.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC. filed by Raising Cane's USA, LLC, Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Higgins, Brigid) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 5/22/2019 (MMM).
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TSR Foods L.L.C., Top Secret Recipes. Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate TS Partners, LLC, Other Affiliate Top Secret Kitchen LLC for TSR Foods L.L.C., Top Secret Recipes. Inc. added. (Krieger, John)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for plaintiff shall have until 4/26/2019 to comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Top Secret Recipes. Inc., TSR Foods L.L.C. re #3 Summons Issued. Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC waiver sent on 3/22/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Krieger, John)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Top Secret Recipes. Inc., TSR Foods L.L.C. re #3 Summons Issued. Raising Cane's USA, LLC waiver sent on 3/22/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Krieger, John)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
March 21, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MR)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5475397) by Top Secret Recipes. Inc., TSR Foods L.L.C.. Proof of service due by 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krieger, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Top Secret Recipes. Inc. et al v. Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSR Foods L.L.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Ko Craft
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Hilary Anne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Top Secret Recipes. Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ko Craft
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Represented By: Hilary Anne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raising Cane's USA, LLC
Represented By: Brigid Higgins
Represented By: Ronald Rothstein
Represented By: Megan L Whipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raising Cane's Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Brigid Higgins
Represented By: Ronald Rothstein
Represented By: Megan L Whipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?