Fredericks v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Deborah Anne Fredericks
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00778
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Compliance by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Steele, Stephen)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Re: #10 Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/8/2019. Motions due by 12/6/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Steele, Stephen)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Deborah Anne Fredericks. (Brasier, Alison)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Deborah Anne Fredericks. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Brasier, Alison)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/27/2019.(Steele, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Steele, Stephen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Steele, Stephen)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/6/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/21/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Steele, Stephen)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-790914-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5536263) by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steele, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fredericks v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Steele
Represented By: Michael R. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Anne Fredericks
Represented By: Alison M. Brasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?