Switch, Ltd. v. L&I LV Enterprise Inc.
Plaintiff: Switch, Ltd.
Defendant: L&I LV Enterprise Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00787
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Switch, Ltd. (Castor, Samuel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation for Settlement and Entry of Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/18/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and Order for Settlement and Entry of Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff Switch, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3.1, #4 Exhibit 3.2) (Castor, Samuel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Switch, Ltd. re #2 Summons Issued. L&I LV Enterprise Inc. served on 5/11/2019, answer due 6/1/2019. (Castor, Samuel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #5 Affidavit. The wrong event was selected. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #5 using the appropriate docket entry title, "Summons Returned Executed". (no image attached) (EDS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Switch, Ltd.. (Castor, Samuel)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Switch, Ltd. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Switch, Inc. for Switch, Ltd. added. (Castor, Samuel)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (JM)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to L&I LV Enterprise Inc. (JM)
May 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L&I LV Enterprise Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5537915) by Switch, Ltd. Proof of service due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Castor, Samuel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 5/7/2019 (JM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Switch, Ltd. v. L&I LV Enterprise Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&I LV Enterprise Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Switch, Ltd.
Represented By: Anne-Marie Birk
Represented By: Samuel D Castor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?