Tann et al v. Namecheap Inc.
Plaintiff: Craig Tann and Craig Tann, Ltd.
Defendant: Namecheap Inc. and Thecheap Name
Case Number: 2:2019cv00788
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Thecheap Name re #4 Amended Complaint. (ADR)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thecheap Name by Craig Tann, Craig Tann, Ltd.. Adds and removes parties. Proof of service due by 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Summons for Thecheap Name)(Austin, F.)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Namecheap Inc. re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC)
May 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JQC)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5537994) by Craig Tann, Craig Tann, Ltd.. Proof of service due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1)(Austin, F.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tann et al v. Namecheap Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Tann
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Tann, Ltd.
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namecheap Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thecheap Name
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?