Norton v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Edward Norton
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00800
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/4/2019.(Mahoney, Scott) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Delta Air Lines, Inc. answer due 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mahoney, Scott)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 First STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Mahoney, Scott) Modified on 5/29/2019 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (DKJ).
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Edward Norton. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Balaban, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MR)
May 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5540519) by Edward Norton. Proof of service due by 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Balaban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Norton
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?