Krick v. QBE Americas, Inc.

Plaintiff: Roy Krick
Defendant: QBE Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00804
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the Court issues this order to advise the parties that discovery motions filed in this case will not be briefed according to the default schedule outlined in Local Rule 7-2(b), but will instead be briefed on shortened deadlines absent leave from the Court, see Local Rule IA 1-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #9 Stipulation re Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/12/2019. Motions due by 12/12/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant QBE Americas, Inc.. (Olster, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant QBE Americas, Inc.. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant QBE Americas, Inc.. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant QBE Americas, Inc.. (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by QBE Americas, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/30/2019.(Olster, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by QBE Americas, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Olster, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/10/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been randomly assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/9/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/24/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-792790-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5541127) by Uniguard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhiit B - Service Transmittal and Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Olster, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krick v. QBE Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Olster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Krick
Represented By: Kimball Joseph Jones
Represented By: Siria L. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?