Hill v. Apartment Management Consultants, LLC

Plaintiff: Stephanie Hill
Defendant: Apartment Management Consultants, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00805
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Arbitration. Once the arbitration is completed, any party may move to lift the stay and for further relief. The Clerk of Court is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 First STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Stay Matter Pending Arbitration by Defendant Apartment Management Consultants, LLC. (Salmonson, Dana)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Apartment Management Consultants, LLC. (Salmonson, Dana)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #8 Order re Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal (Second Request). Apartment Management Consultants, LLC answer due 6/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #8 Order re #1 Petition for Removal by Defendant Apartment Management Consultants, LLC. (Salmonson, Dana)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal. Apartment Management Consultants, LLC answer due 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Apartment Management Consultants, LLC. (Salmonson, Dana)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Apartment Management Consultants, LLC. (Salmonson, Dana)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/9/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/24/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JQC)
May 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Stephanie Hill. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Apartment Management Consultants, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Salmonson, Dana)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-789018-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5541323) by Apartment Management Consultants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Complaint, #3 Exhibit B -Plaintiff's Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure, #4 Exhibit C- Notice of Affidavit of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Salmonson, Dana) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Apartment Management Consultants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hill
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apartment Management Consultants, LLC
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?