Cruz de Ramirez v. Cardenas Markets, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Juana A. Cruz de Ramirez
Defendant: Cardenas Markets, LLC, Cardenas and Lamanza, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00814
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Cardenas Markets, LLC, Lamanza, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/28/2019.(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Juana A. Cruz de Ramirez. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 9/11/2019.(Goldberg, Katie)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Cardenas Markets, LLC, Lamanza, LLC. (Lowry, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Juana A. Cruz de Ramirez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mainor, Bradley)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Cardenas Markets, LLC, Lamanza, LLC. (Lowry, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/10/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/25/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (SLD)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lamanza, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lowry, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 JOINDER to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Lamanza, LLC. (Lowry, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cardenas Markets, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lowry, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-790291-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5544106) by Cardenas Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint with Jury Demand, #3 Arbitration Exemption Request)(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz de Ramirez v. Cardenas Markets, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardenas Markets, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Anne Ebert
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardenas
Represented By: Amanda Anne Ebert
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamanza, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Anne Ebert
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana A. Cruz de Ramirez
Represented By: James Urrutia
Represented By: Katie E. Goldberg
Represented By: Bradley S. Mainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?