Gant v. Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation

Plaintiff: Kenneth Gant
Defendant: Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00816
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/10/2019.(Ketner, Sandra) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Gant re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Foley, Jenny)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation; Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation answer due 6/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Certificate of Interested Parties, by Defendant Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Ketner, Sandra)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 VIEW #7 corrected image re CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation added. (Ketner, Sandra)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Ketner, Sandra)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (ADR)
May 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kenneth Gant. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5544471) by Kenneth Gant. Proof of service due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to be issued)(Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gant v. Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northtrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Represented By: Sandra Ketner
Represented By: Rick D Roskelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gant
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Represented By: Marta D. Kurshumova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?