Goltsos v. State Farm Insuance Company

Plaintiff: Andreas Goltsos
Defendant: State Farm Insuance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00817
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation to Remand to Clark County District Court; Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Certified Docket to State Court - JM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION To Remand Case to State Court by Defendant State Farm Insuance Company. (Ranalli, George)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE REPLY to #4 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Andreas Goltsos. (Bochanis, George) Filed incorrectly by counsel. Event modified by Clerk's Office on 6/12/2019 (EDS).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #4 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Plaintiff's Opposition to #4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Andreas Goltsos. (Bochanis, George)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Andreas Goltsos. Responses due by 6/13/2019. (Bochanis, George)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Insuance Company. (Fowler, Jason)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant State Farm Insuance Company. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - CC) (Ranalli, George)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Insuance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fowler, Jason)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/13/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/28/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-789185-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5544565) by State Farm Insuance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fowler, Jason) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goltsos v. State Farm Insuance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andreas Goltsos
Represented By: George T. Bochanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insuance Company
Represented By: Jason Andrew Fowler
Represented By: George M. Ranalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?