Gomez et al v. Novotny et al
Plaintiff: Leonel Alfaro Zayas, Luis Carmona Escobar and David Alvarado Gomez
Defendant: Jaroslav Novotny and KLC Global Services LTD
Case Number: 2:2019cv00827
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by KLC Global Services LTD. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Aicklen, Josh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER re #7 Petition for Removal, filed by Jaroslav Novotny. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/3/2019.(Aicklen, Josh) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants KLC Global Services LTD, Jaroslav Novotny. (Aicklen, Josh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT in Removal Action by Plaintiffs Luis Carmona Escobar, David Alvarado Gomez, Leonel Alfaro Zayas. (Treese, Clay)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Luis Carmona Escobar, David Alvarado Gomez, Leonel Alfaro Zayas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Treese, Clay)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/31/2019. On May 13, 2019, Defendants removed this action from Clark County District Court on the basis of diversity jurisdiction. (ECF Nos. #2 , #3 ). In asserting the amount in controversy, Defendants aggregated the medical expenses claimed by each Plaintiff. However, "multiple plaintiffs who assert separate and distinct claims are precluded from aggregating them to satisfy the amount in controversy requirement." Urbino v. Orkin Servs. of California, Inc., 726 F.3d 1118, 1122 (9th Cir. 2013) (citing Troy Bank v. G.A. Whitehead & Co., 222 U.S. 39, 40 (1911)). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants show cause as to why the Court should not remand this action to Clark County District Court for failure to satisfy the diversity jurisdiction requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1332. Defendants shall have until June 14, 2019, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, demonstrating that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being remanded to Clark County District Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiffs wish to address the jurisdictional issues implicated by this Order, Plaintiffs shall have until June 14, 2019, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, discussing the concerns herein raised.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ME)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by KLC Global Services LTD. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Aicklen, Josh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #8 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants KLC Global Services LTD, Jaroslav Novotny. (Aicklen, Josh)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/14/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/29/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District, Case Number A-19-789134-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5548112) by Jaroslav Novotny. (Aicklen, Josh) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #2 Notice. The wrong event was selected. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #2 using the appropriate docket entry title, "Petition Removal", under the Commencement of an Action menu, and to pay the filing fee. (no image attached) (EDS)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Jaroslav Novotny. (Aicklen, Josh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT A-D to #2 Notice (Other) by Defendant Jaroslav Novotny. (Aicklen, Josh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 JOINDER to #2 Notice (Other) by Defendant KLC Global Services LTD. (Aicklen, Josh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE; filed by Jaroslav Novotny. (Aicklen, Josh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jaroslav Novotny. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Aicklen, Josh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez et al v. Novotny et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaroslav Novotny
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: Martin Michael Manke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLC Global Services LTD
Represented By: Josh Cole Aicklen
Represented By: Martin Michael Manke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel Alfaro Zayas
Represented By: Clay Treese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Carmona Escobar
Represented By: Clay Treese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Alvarado Gomez
Represented By: Clay Treese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?