Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.
Defendant: Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc. and Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00832
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Balkenbush, Colby)
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/1/2019. Re #22 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply #22 is GRANTED. The deadline for the reply in support of the motion to dismiss #4 is extended to July 2, 2019.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Perach, Amanda)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Stay Case; Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #14 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Gallagher, Kristen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #22 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Balkenbush, Colby)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. Replies due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Balkenbush, Colby)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #14 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. Replies due by 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Balkenbush, Colby)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. Replies due by 6/25/2019. (Perach, Amanda)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Gallagher, Kristen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/11/2019. Re: #14 Motion to Stay Case. Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia) Ltd. moves to stay all proceedings in this case except for its motion to remand #5 , which it seeks to have expedited. But Fremont just stipulated with defendants to extend the briefing schedule on its motion to remand [10, 12] and the court granted the requested extension #13 . Fremont has not shown good cause to now contract that briefing schedule. Accordingly, Fremont's motion to expedite the briefing schedule on its motion remand is DENIED and Fremont's motion to stay all proceedings in this case except for its remand motion is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Ferenbach. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to #15 Response re #14 Motion to Stay Case, by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Gallagher, Kristen) Modified docket entry relationship on 6/10/2019 (DKJ).
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #14 Motion to Stay Case by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. Replies due by 6/13/2019. (Balkenbush, Colby)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Gallagher, Kristen)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation; Re: #4 Motion to Dismiss, #5 Motion to Remand to State Court. Responses for #4 Motion due by 6/18/2019. Responses for #5 Motion due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #10 Stipulation by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Gallagher, Kristen)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #10 . Document is not in compliance with LR IA 6-2 as it does not contain a signature block for the Judge. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #10 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 VIEW #12 corrected image re STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #4 Motion to Dismiss, #5 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Gallagher, Kristen)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Statement in Removal Case, by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gallagher, Kristen)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Balkenbush, Colby)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gallagher, Kristen)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Balkenbush, Colby)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen T. Gallagher, Esq.) (Gallagher, Kristen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. Responses due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Balkenbush, Colby)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/15/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/30/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., UMR, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Roberts, D.)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-792978-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5548762) by Sierra Health Care Options, Inc., Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., United Health Care Services Inc., UMR, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, Inc., Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, D.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd. v. United Healthcare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd.
Represented By: Patricia K Lundvall
Represented By: Amanda M. Perach
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Health Care Options, Inc.
Represented By: Colby Balkenbush
Represented By: Josephine Groh
Represented By: D. Lee Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Colby Balkenbush
Represented By: Josephine Groh
Represented By: D. Lee Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Plan Of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Colby Balkenbush
Represented By: Josephine Groh
Represented By: D. Lee Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMR, Inc.
Represented By: Colby Balkenbush
Represented By: Josephine Groh
Represented By: D. Lee Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care Services Inc.
Represented By: Colby Balkenbush
Represented By: Josephine Groh
Represented By: D. Lee Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Health Plans, Inc.
Represented By: Colby Balkenbush
Represented By: Josephine Groh
Represented By: D. Lee Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Colby Balkenbush
Represented By: Josephine Groh
Represented By: D. Lee Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?