Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Watson Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. and Panion & BF Biotech, Inc.
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Limited and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00837
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
June 4, 2019 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc.. Without Prejudice (Zhong, Meng)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Emily R. Whelan, Kevin Prussia, Lisa J. Pirozzolo, Timothy Cook to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/29/2019. (no image attached) (JM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
May 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Akebia Therapeutics, Inc. for Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. added. (McCue, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Limited, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5550121) by Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Panion & BF Biotech, Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons)(McCue, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Watson Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keryx Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa J. Pirozzolo
Represented By: Emily R. Whelan
Represented By: Timothy A. Cook
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Kevin S. Prussia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panion & BF Biotech, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa J. Pirozzolo
Represented By: Emily R. Whelan
Represented By: Timothy A. Cook
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Kevin S. Prussia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?