Tweedy v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Douglas G. Tweedy
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00853
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Cheung, Allison)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Summons Issued as to USA. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/14/2019. (JQC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Melissa A. Palmer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5623181) by Plaintiff Douglas G. Tweedy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cert. of Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS (0571-SSA, 0564-Atty General) re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #4 Complaint. (JM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM - cc: USM)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Douglas G. Tweedy. Proof of service due by 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JM)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCREENING ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk must file the Complaint and Issue Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (RFJ)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Douglas G. Tweedy. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Douglas G. Tweedy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #4 Summons AG, #5 Summons OGC, #6 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tweedy v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas G. Tweedy
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?