Weddle v. Capital One Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Saskia Weddle
Defendant: Capital One Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00875
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Capital One Services, LLC. (Martin, Suzanne)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #9 Response by Plaintiff Saskia Weddle. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Freiman, Lawrence)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE NOTICE of violation of Local Rule LR IA 10-2. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #9 . Incorrect case number on document. The correct case number is 2:19-cv-00875-JCM-VCF. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #9 . (no image attached) (MMM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 VIEW #11 corrected image to RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Saskia Weddle. Replies due by 7/9/2019. (Freiman, Lawrence)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/28/2019 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. The written evaluation statements shall be submitted, in an envelope marked "Confidential," directly to undersigned's box in the Clerk's Office no later than 3:00 p.m. on 8/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Capital One Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Capital One N.A. for Capital One Services, LLC added. (Martin, Suzanne)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Capital One Services, LLC. Responses due by 7/9/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/9/2019. (Martin, Suzanne) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saskia Weddle re #3 Summons Issued. Capital One Services, LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Freiman, Lawrence)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MMM)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Services, LLC re #1 Complaint. (MR)
May 23, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Saskia Weddle. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Freiman, Lawrence)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Services, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5561426) by Saskia Weddle. Proof of service due by 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Freiman, Lawrence) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weddle v. Capital One Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saskia Weddle
Represented By: Lawrence W Freiman
Represented By: Leah A. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Services, LLC
Represented By: Suzanne L. Martin
Represented By: Brian L. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?