Harris v. Hat World, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexis Harris
Defendant: Hat World, Inc. and LIDS LOCKER ROOM
Case Number: 2:2019cv00882
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Stipulation; Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery to Extend Time to File Proposed Discovery Plan re #7 Answer to Complaint, by Plaintiff Alexis Harris. (Gabroy, Christian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Hat World, Inc.. (McCoy, Robert)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Minutes of the Court) (McCoy, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Hat World, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2019.(Jamison, Joni) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alexis Harris. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/28/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/12/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 28, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JQC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Cheryl A. Sabnis to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/12/2019. (no image attached) (DKJ)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hat World, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Hat World, Inc., Corporate Parent Lids Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Fanzzlids Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Hat World, Inc. for Hat World, Inc. added. (McCoy, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Case No. 2:16-cv-02588, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration in Case No. 2:16-cv-02588, #3 Exhibit C - Joint Motion to Approve Settlement in Case No 2:16-cv-02588) (McCoy, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, District of Nevada, Case Number A-19-793579-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5563295) by Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Thomas Ripley)(McCoy, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Hat World, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Harris
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hat World, Inc.
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Cheryl A. Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIDS LOCKER ROOM
Represented By: Joni A Jamison
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Cheryl A. Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?