Cook v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Cook
Defendant: Harold Thomas, Keolis Transit Services LLC and Keolis Transit America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00908
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Ashley Cook as to Harold Thomas re #15 Summons Issued. (Coleman, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Ashley Cook as to Harold Thomas re #15 Summons Issued. (Coleman, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #17 Ex Parte Motion, by Plaintiff Ashley Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Coleman, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Ashley Cook. (Coleman, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #21 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/24/2020. Motions due by 3/25/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ashley Cook Pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and LR 26-1(b) - Special Scheduling Review Requested (Coleman, Elizabeth)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #17 Ex Parte Motion, by Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC. Replies due by 7/19/2019. (Lowry, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC. Replies due by 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposing Counsel's Letter to Thomas) (Lowry, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Ashley Cook. Replies due by 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Remanding Case to State Court) (Coleman, Elizabeth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 EX PARTE MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint (First Request) by Plaintiff Ashley Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Tracking Results, #2 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence to Defendant Thomas re: Waiver of Service) (Coleman, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT regarding Removal by Plaintiff Ashley Cook. (Coleman, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Harold Thomas re #1 -2 Complaint. (ADR)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ashley Cook. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Coleman, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Ashley Cook. (Coleman, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Harold Thomas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lowry, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Harold Thomas. Responses due by 7/11/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/11/2019. (Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Ashley Cook. Responses due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Compliance) (Coleman, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #8 Motion. The wrong event was selected. T Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #8 using the appropriate docket event, Motion to Remand. (no image attached) (EDS)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Ashley Cook. Responses due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Compliance)(Coleman, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT to #6 AFFIDAVIT of Due Diligence, filed by Plaintiff Ashley Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Traffic Crash Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Due Diligence, #3 Exhibit 3 - Investigation Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter to Nevada DMV, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Nevada DMV, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter to Defendant Harold Thomas, #7 Exhibit 7 - Returned parcel)(Coleman, Elizabeth) Document not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 by attorney Elizabeth E Coleman. Court modified exhibit 4 in accordance with FRCP 5.2 (RFJ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Due Diligence; filed by Ashley Cook. Harold Thomas served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Traffic Crash Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Due Diligence, #3 Exhibit 3 - Investigation Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter to Nevada DMV, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Nevada DMV, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter to Defendant Harold Thomas, #7 Exhibit 7 - Returned parcel)(Coleman, Elizabeth) Document not filed pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Elizabeth E Coleman. Court modified exhibit 4 in accordance with FRCP 5.2 and corrected event entry. (RFJ)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC. (Lowry, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/29/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/13/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 29, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Keolis Transit Services LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/13/2019.(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Keolis Transit Services LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lowry, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-793832-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5567111) by Keolis Transit Services LLC. Proof of service due by 7/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Demand Letter)(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Thomas
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Represented By: Amanda Anne Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keolis Transit Services LLC
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Represented By: Amanda Anne Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keolis Transit America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Cook
Represented By: Farhan R Naqvi
Represented By: Elizabeth E Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?