Roberts v. Keolis Transit Services LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Joseph Roberts
Defendant: Keolis Transit Services LLC and Keolis Transit America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00943
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC (Lowry, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT RE REMOVAL; filed by Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC. (Lowry, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report no later than 7/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramzy P Ladah on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Roberts. (Ladah, Ramzy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Keolis Transit Services LLC. (Lowry, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 6/3/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/18/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Keolis Transit Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Keolis Transit America, Inc. for Keolis Transit Services LLC added. (Lowry, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-788488-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5572562) by Keolis Transit Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Demand for Security of Costs, #4 Security of Costs, #5 Answer with Jury Demand, #6 Rule 41 Dismissal of separate defendant, #7 Arb Petition)(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Keolis Transit Services LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keolis Transit Services LLC
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Represented By: Amanda Anne Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keolis Transit America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Roberts
Represented By: Farhan R Naqvi
Represented By: Paul Gregory Albright
Represented By: Ramzy P Ladah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?