Schuett v. Kohen
Petitioner: Clifford J. Schuett
Respondent: Kohen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00950
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Refused re #3 Order, #4 Judgment, addressed to Clifford J. Schuett. No new address available; Unable to remail. (MR)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Advisory, addressed to Clifford J. Schuett. No new address available; Unable to remail. (MR)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT this action is dismissed without prejudice. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the petition in this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is DENIED a certificate of appealability, as jurists of reason would not find the Court's dismissal of the petition to be debatable or wrong. The Clerk of Court shall enter final judgment accordingly and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Kohen has been received and assigned case number 2:19-cv-00950-RFB-BNW. (MR)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Clifford J. Schuett. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (MR)
June 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuett v. Kohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford J. Schuett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?