Ross-Nash v. Almond
Plaintiff: Kathryn Ross-Nash
Defendant: Sunni Almond
Case Number: 2:2019cv00957
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Plaintiff Kathryn Ross-Nash, Counter Defendant Kathryn Ross-Nash. (Barney, David)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/28/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Counter Claimant Sunni Almond. (JM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/11/2019.) COUNTERCLAIM against Kathryn Ross-Nash by Sunni Almond. filed by Sunni Almond.(JM) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Ross-Nash re #1 Complaint,,. Sunni Almond served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Barney, David)
June 10, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kathryn Ross-Nash. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Barney, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (JM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sunni Almond. (JM)
June 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sunni Almond (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5576455) by Kathryn Ross-Nash. Proof of service due by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Barney, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross-Nash v. Almond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunni Almond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Ross-Nash
Represented By: David Benjamin Barney
Represented By: Philip A. Kantor
Represented By: Philip Kantor
Represented By: David B. Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?