Hitchen Post Dr. Trust v. South Valley Ranch Comm. Assn.
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., successor by merger to BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP FKA COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP and Hitchen Post Drive Trust
Defendant: Homeowner Association Services, Inc. and Hitchen Post Dr. Trust
Petitioner: South Valley Ranch Community Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv00977
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant South Valley Ranch Community Association. Responses due by 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Maupin, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant South Valley Ranch Community Association. (Maupin, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant South Valley Ranch Community Association. (Maupin, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/10/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/25/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by South Valley Ranch Community Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Maupin, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from State of Nevada Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-794185-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5580146) by South Valley Ranch Community Association. Proof of service due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Maupin, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitchen Post Dr. Trust v. South Valley Ranch Comm. Assn.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: South Valley Ranch Community Association
Represented By: Michael David Maupin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeowner Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitchen Post Dr. Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., successor by merger to BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP FKA COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hitchen Post Drive Trust
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?