Ramirez v. Saul

Plaintiff: Michelle M. Ramirez
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv00978
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erik W. Berger for Michelle M. Ramirez and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/26/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7017 3380 0000 4606 2072 re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #4 Complaint. (ADR)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erik W. Berger and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5591277) by Plaintiff Michelle M. Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Kramer Marriott on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle M. Ramirez Defendant. (Marriott, Michael) Modified on 6/19/2019 (EDS).
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 USM Return Executed/Unexecuted re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #4 Complaint. Andrew Saul served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (ADR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS 7017 3380 0000 4606 2089 and 7017 3380 0000 4606 2072 re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #4 Complaint. (ADR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cc: USM - ADR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Michelle M. Ramirez. Proof of service due by 9/9/2019.(ADR)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - ADR) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/12/2019) (ADR).
June 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (EDS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michelle M. Ramirez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michelle M. Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons US Atty, #4 Summons Atty Gen, #5 Summons OGC) (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Michael Kramer Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle M. Ramirez
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Erik W. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?