Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd. v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "B"
Plaintiff: Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.
Defendant: Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "B"
Case Number: 2:2019cv00980
Filed: June 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
2 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-00980-RFB-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
June 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (MR)
June 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff WINNERS SUN PLASTIC & ELECTRONIC (SHENZHEN) CO. LTD.. (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
June 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by WINNERS SUN PLASTIC & ELECTRONIC (SHENZHEN) CO. LTD. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate DESHENG investment Co. Ltd. for WINNERS SUN PLASTIC & ELECTRONIC (SHENZHEN) CO. LTD. added. (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
June 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE PARTNERSHIPS and UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE B (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5580304) by WINNERS SUN PLASTIC & ELECTRONIC (SHENZHEN) CO. LTD.. Proof of service due by 9/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 AO120, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Schedule B)(Bayramoglu, Nihat) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd. v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "B"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "B"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?