Pajarillo v. U.S. Bank National Association
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Fidel H. Pajarillo
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2019cv01020
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE from Bankruptcy Court re Related document 100 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Fidel H. Pajarillo. (ADR)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Extend Time re 15 Minute Order Bankruptcy Briefing Schedule (First Request), by Appellant Fidel H. Pajarillo. (MR)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE from Bankruptcy Court re Related document 96 Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan. (ADR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/29/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the appellant shall have a period of 14 days from the date of this order to file/serve an opening brief. Appellee shall have 14 days after to file/serve an answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have 14 days to file/serve a final reply brief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file and serve excerpts of the record as an appendix to the appellant brief pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(b) and LR IC 2-2. Appellee may also file/serve an appendix with appellee brief which contains required material omitted by appellant. Opening brief due by 8/12/2019. Answering brief due by 8/26/2019. Reply brief due by 9/9/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Referral of Appeal to USDC re Amended Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal form, #2 Appeal Memorandum, #3 Notice re Appeal Documents) (ADR)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Readiness. (ADR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019: #1 Appellant's Designation of Record, #2 Appellee's Designation of Record, #3 Docket for 19-10388-btb) (AF).
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appellee's Supplemental Designation of Record on Appeal re #1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court by U.S. Bank National Association. (Chen, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank National Association that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Chen, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #8 , #9 . Documents were not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the documents. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #8 , #9 using the appropriate docket entry title.1. Refile document #8 as "Certificate of Interested Parties". 2. Refile #9 as Designation of Record on Appeal" and add Supplemental to the docket text. Documents #8 and #9 are terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Error: Incorrect event selected by attorney. Attorney advised to refile correctly. Document #9 terminated. ANSWER to Complaint Appellee's Supplemental Designation of Record on Appeal filed by U.S. Bank National Association.(Chen, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Error: Incorrect event selected by attorney. Attorney advised to refile correctly. Document #8 terminated. ANSWER to Complaint Appellee's Corporate Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/2/2019.(Chen, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re Debtor's Designation of Record, by Fidel H. Pajarillo. (MR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Status Report re Record on Appeal (JM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Statement of Issues, by Fidel H. Pajarillo. (MR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE re Designation of No Transcripts, by Fidel H. Pajarillo. (MR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Amended NOTICE of Election, by Fidel H. Pajarillo. (MR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/17/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number BK-19-10388-btb. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Referral) (ADR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #2 Transmittal Form, #3 Appeal Memorandum) (ADR).
June 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pajarillo v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fidel H. Pajarillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Michael W. Chen
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?