Diaz v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Maria Diaz
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01024
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01024-KJD-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Maria Diaz. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ladah, Ramzy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #8 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Motions due by 4/13/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation (Federico, Michael)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re: for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, fild by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/17/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/2/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (SLD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/1/2019.(Federico, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Costco Wholesale Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Federico, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-794751-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5590353) by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Henderson Hospital report, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Petition, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Federico, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Federico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Diaz
Represented By: Carl R Houston
Represented By: Ramzy P Ladah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?