Cimini v. White et al
Plaintiff: Shelley Cimini
Defendant: Rico White and Sutherland Global Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01027
Filed: June 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shelley Cimini. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lee, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Shelley Cimini. (Lee, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued For Sutherland by Plaintiff Shelley Cimini. (Lee, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Rico White by Plaintiff Shelley Cimini. (Lee, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/24/2019. Plaintiff was ordered to file a certificate of interested parties by June 21, 2019, Docket No. 3, but has not done so. The Court again orders Plaintiff to file a certificate of interested parties, this time by June 27, 2019. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/18/2019. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Plaintiff failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than June 21, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JM)
June 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM) Modified file date on 6/17/2019 (JM).
June 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5588868) by Shelley Cimini. Proof of service due by 9/14/2019.(Lee, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cimini v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rico White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutherland Global Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Cimini
Represented By: James J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?