Cohen v. Whitley et al
Plaintiff: Steven Cohen
Defendant: Deborah Bierman, State of Nevada, Heather Lazarakis, Cody Phinney, Suzanne, Marcel Brown, Tammy Moffitt, Emily Kuhlman and Richard Whitley
Case Number: 2:2019cv01033
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01033-APG-EJY. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have until 8/30/19 to file an amended complaint correcting the noted deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Steven Cohen. (ADR)
June 18, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400) by Steven Cohen. Proof of service due by 9/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt No. NVLAS064395)(ADR)
June 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Whitley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Bierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Lazarakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Phinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?