Sears et al v. Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Najome Colon, Rachel Bernstein, Rachel Koren, Gia Macool, Emily Sears, Mariana Davalos and Lucy Pinder
Defendant: Russo Foods, LLC, SN Investment Properties, LLC and Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01091
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bendavid, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SN Investment Properties, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bendavid, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/19/2019. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Defendants failed to file certificates of interested parties. Accordingly, Defendants must file certificates of interested parties no later than August 22, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint, by Defendant SN Investment Properties, LLC. Responses due by 8/30/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit) (Bendavid, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, filed by Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC.(Bendavid, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC. Responses due by 8/30/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/30/2019. (Bendavid, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #8 Amended Complaint. Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC and SN Investment Properties, LLC answer due 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #8 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC, SN Investment Properties, LLC. (Bendavid, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/13/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #8 Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC, SN Investment Properties, LLC. (Bendavid, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC, SN Investment Properties, LLC re #8 Amended Complaint. (JQC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC, SN Investment Properties, LLC by Lucy Pinder, Mariana Davalos, Najome Colon, Rachel Bernstein, Emily Sears. Removes parties. Proof of service due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Summons SN Investment, #7 Summons Russell Road Food and Beverage)(Sexton, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Lucy Pinder, Mariana Davalos, Najome Colon, Rachel Bernstein, Emily Sears as to Russo Foods, LLC re #4 Summons Issued. (Sexton, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Lucy Pinder, Mariana Davalos, Najome Colon, Rachel Bernstein, Emily Sears as to Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC re #4 Summons Issued. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Of Attempted Service)(Sexton, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucy Pinder, Mariana Davalos, Najome Colon, Rachel Bernstein, Emily Sears re #4 Summons Issued. SN Investment Properties, LLC served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Of Service)(Sexton, David)
June 26, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
June 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rachel Bernstein, Najome Colon, Mariana Davalos, Lucy Pinder, Emily Sears. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sexton, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5598929) by Lucy Pinder, Mariana Davalos, Najome Colon, Rachel Bernstein, Emily Sears. Proof of service due by 9/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons Russell Road, #8 Summons Summons Russo Foods, #9 Summons Summons SN Investment)(Bonds, Kurt) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sears et al v. Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Najome Colon
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bernstein
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Koren
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gia Macool
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Sears
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russo Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN Investment Properties, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bendavid
Represented By: Stephanie Joy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Road Food And Beverage, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bendavid
Represented By: Stephanie Joy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?