Schuett v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Clifford J. Schuett
Defendant: Las Vegas Correctional Center, Mentos, G Gonzalez and S Lucas
Case Number: 2:2019cv01100
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01100-GMN-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER re #4 Motion from Clifford J. Schuett dated 7/8/2019. (MR)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Court Order Directing BOP to Provide Documents re #3 Order, by Plaintiff Clifford J. Schuett. Responses due by 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (MR)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain #1 -1 the complaint, but shall not file it at this time.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff a courtesy copy of #1 -1 the complaint received by the Court.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint and instructions for the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - (copy of complaint sent to P) - MR)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Clifford J. Schuett. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
June 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuett v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford J. Schuett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?