Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Wild West Gaming, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Concord Music Group, Inc., EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Galeneye Music, Rondor Music International, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation and Unichappell Music Inc.
Defendant: Wild West Gaming, LLC, Noel Sheckells and Thomas B. Sheckells
Case Number: 2:2019cv01104
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01104-JCM-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Noel Sheckells, Thomas B. Sheckells, Wild West Gaming, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hansen, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by Noel Sheckells, Thomas B. Sheckells, Wild West Gaming, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/14/2019.(Hansen, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (SLD)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
June 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Combine Music Corp., Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a/ Jondora Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Galeneye Music, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music, Unichappell Music Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Blackwood Music Inc.; Corporate Parent EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. for Combine Music Corp.; Corporate Parent Eighth Note, Inc. for Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a/ Jondora Music; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Unichappell Music Inc.; Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music; Corporate Parent Capitol EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music added. (Alarie, Michelle)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5601392) by Combine Music Corp., Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a Sony/ATV Acuff Rose Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a/ Jondora Music, Galeneye Music, Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc.. Proof of service due by 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Noel Sheckells, #3 Index Thomas Sheckells, #4 Summons Wild West Gaming LLC dba Pioneer Saloon)(Alarie, Michelle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Wild West Gaming, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combine Music Corp.
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Music Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music Inc.
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galeneye Music
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechwood Music Corporation
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild West Gaming, LLC
Represented By: Amy M. Wilson
Represented By: Kevin Rene Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Sheckells
Represented By: Amy M. Wilson
Represented By: Kevin Rene Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B. Sheckells
Represented By: Amy M. Wilson
Represented By: Kevin Rene Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?