Reyes v. State of Nevada ex. rel. Nevada Department of Transportation
Plaintiff: Anthony Reyes
Defendant: State of Nevada ex. rel. Nevada Department of Transportation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01114
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/22/2019. Re: #7 Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session. The Court finds its Order setting an Early Neutral Evaluation (ECF No. 7) entered August 15, 2019, was premature as the Defendant has not yet appeared, accordingly, the Court's Order (ECF No. 7) is withdrawn, and the Early Neutral Evaluation set December 13, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable Daniel J. Albregts is vacated. The Early Neutral Evaluation will be rescheduled once the Defendant makes its first appearance. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/13/2019 in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Plaintiff shall report at 9:30 a.m. and Defendants shall report at 10:00 a.m. The written evaluation statements must be submitted directly to chambers-Room 3099-by 4:00 p.m. on 12/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts will be the evaluating judge in this case for Early Neutral Evaluation. (no image attached) (AF)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01114-APG-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. Plaintiff shall file his Certificate as to Interested Parties which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to State of Nevada ex. rel. Nevada Department of Transportation re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
June 27, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (SLD)
June 26, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Nevada (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5603104) by Anthony Reyes. Proof of service due by 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Trenchak, Philip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 6/26/2019 to reflect correct party (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes v. State of Nevada ex. rel. Nevada Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Reyes
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Represented By: Victoria Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada ex. rel. Nevada Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?