Vanatta v. Cottelit et al
Plaintiff: Attila Ragnvald Vanatta
Defendant: Christopher John Cottelit, Power Contracting, LLC and Pike Electric, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01127
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #13 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/6/2020. Motions due by 2/7/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendants Christopher John Cottelit, Pike Electric, LLC, Power Contracting, LLC (Cavanaugh, Matthew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Attila Ragnvald Vanatta. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Troiano, Joseph)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/30/2019. The court has read and considered the parties' #8 proposed discovery plan and scheduling order, which requests a discovery period of 240 days to accommodate potential alternative dispute resolution. The parties do not provide the court with sufficient detail to evaluate whether special scheduling review is appropriate under Local Rule 26-1. The proposed discovery plan and scheduling order therefore is DENIED without prejudice for the parties to meet and confer and file a more detailed statement regarding special scheduling review. The deadline for filing the revised proposed discovery plan and scheduling order is 8/20/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LAA)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Christopher John Cottelit.(Cavanaugh, Matthew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Pike Electric, LLC, Power Contracting, LLC. (Cavanaugh, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendants Pike Electric, LLC, Power Contracting, LLC (Cavanaugh, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff shall file her certificate of interested parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 8/8/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Attila Ragnvald Vanatta. Christopher John Cottelit served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Troiano, Joseph)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Pike Electric, LLC, Power Contracting, LLC. (Cavanaugh, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal filed by Pike Electric, LLC, Power Contracting, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/24/2019.(Cavanaugh, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pike Electric, LLC, Power Contracting, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cavanaugh, Matthew)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 6/27/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/12/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-790422-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5604795) by Power Contracting, LLC, Pike Electric, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Cavanaugh, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanatta v. Cottelit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher John Cottelit
Represented By: Matthew Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pike Electric, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attila Ragnvald Vanatta
Represented By: Jamie S Cogburn
Represented By: Joseph J Troiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?