SL International Management Company, Inc. v. Derby Spirits, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SL International Management Company, Inc.
Defendant: Derby Spirits, LLC, Sami Omar and Jeffrey Tomastik
Case Number: 2:2019cv01148
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Derby Spirits, LLC, Sami Omar and Jeffrey Tomastik answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer or Respond re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Derby Spirits, LLC, Sami Omar, Jeffrey Tomastik. (Ajemian, Peter)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #2 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel David B. Barney. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/9/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
July 1, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (MR)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SL International Management Company, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Barney, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christian W. Liedtke and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David B. Barney (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5608937) by Plaintiff SL International Management Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Barney, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SL International Management Company, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5608934) by SL International Management Company, Inc.. Proof of service due by 9/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons - Derby Spirits LLC, #7 Summons Summons - Sami Omar, #8 Summons Summons - Jeffrey Tomastik)(Barney, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SL International Management Company, Inc. v. Derby Spirits, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SL International Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Benjamin Barney
Represented By: Christian W. Liedtke
Represented By: David B. Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derby Spirits, LLC
Represented By: Peter H. Ajemian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sami Omar
Represented By: Peter H. Ajemian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Tomastik
Represented By: Peter H. Ajemian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?