Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC v. North American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01151
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01151-JAD-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER. Re: #8 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/30/2020. Motions due by 4/29/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC - Special Scheduling Review Requested (Winslow, Natalie)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Wood, Brittany)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Winslow, Natalie)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Maurice, Aaron)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by North American Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent States Title Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate U.S. Home Corporation, Other Affiliate Lennar Corporation, Other Affiliate CalAtlantic Title Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Lennar Financial Services, LLC, Other Affiliate LFS Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Saslaw-Simkoff Revocable Trust, Other Affiliate Foundation Capital VIII, L.P. for North American Title Insurance Company added. (Maurice, Aaron)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by North American Title Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/16/2019.(Maurice, Aaron) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/2/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/17/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 2, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JQC)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-796204-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5609670) by North American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Maurice, Aaron) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC v. North American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Aaron R. Maurice
Represented By: Elizabeth Aronson
Represented By: Brittany Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?