Seagears et al v. Lindsey
Plaintiff: Work or Don't Eat, LLC and Jermaine R. Seagears
Defendant: Jacquez C. Lindsey
Case Number: 2:2019cv01161
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rule LR IA 10-2. ECF No. #10 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Incorrect case number on document. See Clerk's Notice at ECF No. 9 . Attorney Nathan Ring is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Jermaine R. Seagears, Work or Don't Eat, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Declaration, #7 Exhibit) (Ring, Nathan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01161-GMN-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jacquez C. Lindsey re #7 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (JQC)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default; filed by Plaintiffs Jermaine R. Seagears, Work or Don't Eat, LLC. (Urban, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jermaine R. Seagears, Work or Don't Eat, LLC re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. (Urban, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jermaine R. Seagears, Work or Don't Eat, LLC re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Jacquez C. Lindsey served on 7/14/2019, answer due 8/4/2019. (Urban, Michael)
July 5, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
July 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (JM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jermaine R. Seagears, Work or Don't Eat, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Urban, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacquez C. Lindsey, individually and dba Clutch Game Gear (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5611563) by Jermaine R. Seagears, Work or Don't Eat, LLC. Proof of service due by 10/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Urban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seagears et al v. Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Work or Don't Eat, LLC
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine R. Seagears
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquez C. Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?