Souder v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Denise Souder
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01165
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 2290 0001 8797 0038 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-001165-APG-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT (#7018 2290 0001 8797 0021) re #4 Complaint and #5 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. (SLD)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. U.S. Attorney served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/29/2019. (MR)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipts 7018 2290 0001 8797 0038 and 7018 2290 0001 8797 0021 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA re #4 Complaint. (MR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cc: USM for Service AUSA summons & #4 Complaint - MR)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul by Denise Souder. Proof of service due by 10/27/2019. (MR)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court must file the complaint. The Clerk of the Court must serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and complaint by certified mail. The Clerk of Court must issue summons to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR)
July 8, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
July 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MMM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Denise Souder. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Denise Souder. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souder v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Souder
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?