Ramirez v. Wynn Las Vegas, LLC
Plaintiff: Tiare Ramirez
Defendant: Wynn Las Vegas, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01174
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
2 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kaine M. Messer on behalf of Plaintiff Tiare Ramirez. (Messer, Kaine)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #15 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/10/2020. Motions due by 5/11/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Wynn Las Vegas, LLC (Ketner, Sandra)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01174-RFB-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT RE Removal; filed by Defendant Wynn Las Vegas, LLC. (Ketner, Sandra)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Wynn Las Vegas, LLC. (Ketner, Sandra)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation. Early Neutral Evaluation rescheduled for 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The confidential statement is due by 4:00 PM on 9/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST STIPULATION TO CONTINUE re: #7 ORDER - Early Neutral Evaluation; filed by Plaintiff Tiare Ramirez. (Gabroy, Christian) Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Christian James Gabroy. Court corrected entry on 7/19/2019 (RFJ).
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Wynn Las Vegas, LLC.(Ketner, Sandra)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Wynn Las Vegas, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/29/2019.(Ketner, Sandra) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The written evaluation statements must be delivered directly to chambers in a sealed envelope not later than 4:00 p.m. on 8/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/8/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/23/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (SLD)
July 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (SLD)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties,, by Defendant Wynn Las Vegas, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Ketner, Sandra)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tiare Ramirez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gabroy, Christian)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 VIEW Corrected Image #4 as to CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wynn Las Vegas, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Wynn Resorts Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Wynn Sunrise, LLC, Other Affiliate Wynn Show Performers, LLC, Other Affiliate Wynn Las Vegas Capital Corp., Other Affiliate World Travel, LLC, Other Affiliate Kevyn LLC, Other Affiliate Wynn Resorts, Limited, Other Affiliate WLV Events, LLC, Other Affiliate Wynn America, LLC, Other Affiliate Wynn Las Vegas Holdings, LLC for Wynn Las Vegas, LLC added. (Ketner, Sandra) Modified on 7/9/2019 (RFJ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-796471-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5614329) by Wynn Las Vegas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Ketner, Sandra) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Wynn Las Vegas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: Wendy M. Krincek
Represented By: Sandra Ketner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiare Ramirez
Represented By: Christian James Gabroy
Represented By: Kaine M. Messer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?