English v. JB Hunt Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann English
Defendant: JB Hunt Transport, Inc., Timothy Bowman and Timothy Alan Bowman
Case Number: 2:2019cv01176
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Due Diligence re #5 Amended Complaint, #7 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Barbara Ann English. (Beal, Garnet)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO PLAINTIFF by JB Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Thorpe, William)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission for William L. Thorpe to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Renee Finch. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/8/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William L. Thorpe and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Renee M. Finch (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5655500) by Defendant JB Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Finch, Renee)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT [Pursuant to 7-9-19 Order (Doc. 3) by Defendant JB Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Baltierra, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint filed by JB Hunt Transport, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/13/2019.(Finch, Renee) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to JB Hunt Transport, Inc. re #5 Amended Complaint. (ADR)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued J.B. Hunt Transportation, Inc. by Plaintiff Barbara Ann English. (Beal, Garnet)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #9 Certificate of Interested Parties by Plaintiff Barbara Ann English. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Beal, Garnet)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rule LR IA 10-2. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #9 . Incorrect case number on document. The correct case number is 2:19-cv-01176-APG-VCF. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #9 . (no image attached) (MMM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 VIEW #11 corrected image to CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Barbara Ann English. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Beal, Garnet)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant JB Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Thorpe, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Timothy Alan Bowman re #5 Amended Complaint. (MR) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/12/2019 - nef regenerated) (MR).
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Timothy Alan Bowman by Plaintiff Barbara Ann English. (Beal, Garnet)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Barbara Ann English. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 10/8/2019.(Beal, Garnet)
July 10, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel William L. Thorpe to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/23/2019. (no image attached) (JM) Modified on 7/9/2019 to remove incorrect attorney name (JM).
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/9/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/24/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JB Hunt Transport, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for JB Hunt Transport, Inc. added. (Finch, Renee)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-794731-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5614736) by JB Hunt Transport, Inc.. Proof of service due by 8/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Finch, Renee) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English v. JB Hunt Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann English
Represented By: Garnet E Beal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Renee M Finch
Represented By: Matthew Baltierra
Represented By: William L Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Alan Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?