Parsons et al v. Colt's Manufacturing Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ann-Marie Parsons and James Parsons
Defendant: DF&A Holdings LLC, Discount Firearms and Ammo LLC, Guns and Guitars Inc., FN Herstal, LWRC International LLC, Patriot Ordnance Factory, Lewis Machine & Tool Company, Maverick Investments LP, Colt Defense LLC, Herstal Group, Noveske Rifleworks LLC, Daniel Defense Inc., Colt's Manufacturing Company LLC, FN America, Christensen Arms and Sportman's Warehouse
Case Number: 2:2019cv01189
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION re Discovery Stipulation and (Proposed Order) to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. (Sharp, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael J. Nunez on behalf of Defendant Guns and Guitars Inc.. (Nunez, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY to Response to #50 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. A - Excerpt of Report) (Friedman, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sharp, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting #42 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: Complaint contained in #1 Petition for Removal. Remaining Defendants' answer due 9/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christensen Arms that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Jason Christensen, Other Affiliate Roland Christensen for Christensen Arms added. (Schuttert, Jay)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE to #46 Motion to Remand to State Court, #50 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant FN America. Replies due by 8/29/2019. (Chong, Jessica)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Colt Defense LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate CDH II HoldCo Inc. for Colt Defense LLC added. (Schuttert, Jay)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by LWRC International LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Riftech LLC, Other Affiliate RB Acquisitions LLC for LWRC International LLC added. (Schuttert, Jay)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lewis Machine & Tool Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schuttert, Jay)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Colt's Manufacturing Company LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Colt Defense LLC, Other Affiliate New Colt Holding Corp, Other Affiliate CDH II HoldCo Inc. for Colt's Manufacturing Company LLC added. (Schuttert, Jay)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Loren Young on behalf of Defendant Noveske Rifleworks LLC. (Young, Loren)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE to #32 Memorandum by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. (Friedman, Richard)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Party FN Herstal and Herstal Group terminated with prejudice per #51 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SLD)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants FN Herstal and Herstal Group by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. (Sharp, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Responses due by 8/23/2019. (Friedman, Richard)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #46 Motion to Remand. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to file the Reply contained within ECF No. #46 as a separate entry, linking to underlying document. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. (Sharp, Matthew)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01189-APG-EJY. (no image attached) (JM)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Responses due by 8/22/2019. (Friedman, Richard)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sportman's Warehouse that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Sportsman's Warehouse Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for Sportman's Warehouse added. (Bohman, V.)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Patriot Ordnance Factory that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Frank DeSomma for Patriot Ordnance Factory added. (Bohman, V.)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Daniel Defense Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent M.C. Daniel Group, Inc. for Daniel Defense Inc. added. (Bohman, V.)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: Complaint contained in #1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL; filed by Defendants Christensen Arms, Colt Defense LLC, Colt's Manufacturing Company LLC, LWRC International LLC, Lewis Machine & Tool Company. (Schuttert, Jay)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting #37 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert C. Van Arnam and approving Attorney John H. Mowbray as Designation of Local Counsel for FN America, LLC. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/8/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting #36 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Turner A. Broughton and approving Attorney John H. Mowbray as Designation of Local Counsel for FN America, LLC. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/8/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #35 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin S. Feinman and approving Attorney John H. Mowbray as Designation of Local Counsel for FN America, LLC. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/8/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting #34 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Camden R. Webb and approving Attorney John H. Mowbray as Designation of Local Counsel for FN America, LLC. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/8/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert C. Van Arnam and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John H. Mowbray (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5656085) by Defendant FN America. (Mowbray, John)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Turner A. Broughton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John H. Mowbray (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5655991) by Defendant FN America. (Mowbray, John)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Justin S. Feinman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John H. Mowbray (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5655964) by Defendant FN America. (Mowbray, John)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Camden R. Webb and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel John H. Mowbray (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5655923) by Defendant FN America. (Mowbray, John)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Guns and Guitars Inc. served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM RESPONSE to #7 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant FN America. (Chong, Jessica) Modified on 8/7/2019 (MMM).
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. LWRC International LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Patriot Ordnance Factory served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Colt's Manufacturing Company LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Acceptance of Service SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Daniel Defense Inc. served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Sharp, Matthew) Modified on 7/30/2019 to reflect correct event (DKJ).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Sportman's Warehouse served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Christensen Arms served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #24 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. FN America answer due 9/24/2019; Ann-Marie Parsons answer due 9/24/2019; James Parsons answer due 9/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for FN America, LLC, FN Herstal and The Herstal Group to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant FN America. (Chong, Jessica)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Colt Defense LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Lewis Machine & Tool Company served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STATEMENT in REMOVAL/ RESPONSE to #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant FN America. (Chong, Jessica)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Noveske Rifleworks LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Maverick Investments LP served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. Discount Firearms and Ammo LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. DF&A Holdings LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Matthew L. Sharp. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Matthew L. Sharp. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/23/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Katherine L. Mesner-Hage and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew L. Sharp (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5632949) by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joshua D. Koskoff and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew L. Sharp (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5632917) by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to FN America, FN Herstal, Herstal Group re Complaint contained in the #1 Petition for Removal. (SLD)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Sharp, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Christensen Arms, Colt Defense LLC, Colt's Manufacturing Company LLC, DF&A Holdings LLC, Daniel Defense Inc., Discount Firearms and Ammo LLC, Guns and Guitars Inc., LWRC International LLC, Lewis Machine & Tool Company, Maverick Investments LP, Noveske Rifleworks LLC, Patriot Ordnance Factory, Sportman's Warehouse re Complaint contained in the #1 Petition for Removal. (SLD) .
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Sharp, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiffs Ann-Marie Parsons, James Parsons. (Sharp, Matthew)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant FN America's Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2019. Response Brief due by 8/19/2019. Reply due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Jessica E. Chong is advised to review and update her user account information. (no image attached) (EDS)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #1 Petition for Removal was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. In this instance, the efiling account of John Mowbray was used to file a document signed by Jessica Chong. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (EDS)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by FN America that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent FN America, LLC, Corporate Parent FN America, Inc., Corporate Parent FN Herstal, S.A., Corporate Parent Herstal, S.A. for FN America added. (Mowbray, John)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Joshua D. Koskoff, Katherine Mesner-Hage, Turner A. Broughton, Justin S. Feinman, Camden R. Webb to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/24/2019. (no image attached) (SLD)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/10/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/25/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (SLD)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-797891-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5616635) by FN America. Proof of service due by 9/30/2019. (Mowbray, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons et al v. Colt's Manufacturing Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DF&A Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Firearms and Ammo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guns and Guitars Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FN Herstal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LWRC International LLC
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Ordnance Factory
Represented By: V. R. Bohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Machine & Tool Company
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maverick Investments LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Defense LLC
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herstal Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noveske Rifleworks LLC
Represented By: Loren Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Defense Inc.
Represented By: V. R. Bohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt's Manufacturing Company LLC
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FN America
Represented By: Justin S. Feinman
Represented By: John H Mowbray
Represented By: Jessica E. Chong
Represented By: Mary E Bacon
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Represented By: Camden R. Webb
Represented By: Jessica Chong
Represented By: Robert C. Van Arnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christensen Arms
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportman's Warehouse
Represented By: V. R. Bohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann-Marie Parsons
Represented By: Joshua D. Koskoff
Represented By: Katherine Mesner-Hage
Represented By: Matthew L. Sharp
Represented By: Richard Friedman
Represented By: Joshua David Koskoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Parsons
Represented By: Joshua D. Koskoff
Represented By: Katherine Mesner-Hage
Represented By: Matthew L. Sharp
Represented By: Richard Friedman
Represented By: Joshua David Koskoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?